US HR467 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2112) making appropriations for Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies programs for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2012.
Title
Providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2112) making appropriations for Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies programs for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-17 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 262 N: 156 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-11-17 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 262 - 156 (Roll no. 856). (text: CR H7733) |
2011-11-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7745-7746) |
2011-11-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 467, the Chair put the question on adoption of the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Slaughter demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the resolution until a time to be announced. |
2011-11-17 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7737) |
2011-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 467. |
2011-11-17 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7733-7737) |
2011-11-16 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92. |
2011-11-16 | House | All points of order against the conference report and against its consideration are waived. The conference report shall be considered as read. The conference report shall be debatable for one hour. |
2011-11-16 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 112-290, by Ms. Foxx. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2112 (Related) 2011-11-18 - Became Public Law No: 112-55.