US HR240 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates National Whistleblower Appreciation Day.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of July 30, 2019, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR194 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/8/2019 S2746-2747)
SR634 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129)
SR634 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/240/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres240/BILLS-116hres240ih.pdf |