US SR634 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates July 30, 2020, as National Whistleblower Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution designating July 30, 2020, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129) |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4163) |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR240 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR194 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/8/2019 S2746-2747)
SR194 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/8/2019 S2746-2747)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics