US SR194 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/8/2019 S2746-2747)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/8/2019 S2746-2747)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates July 30, 2019, as National Whistleblower Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution designating July 30, 2019, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/8/2019 S2746-2747) |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5018-5019) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR240 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR634 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129)
SR634 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/22/20 CR S3128-3129)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics