US HR175 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the designation of the week of June 1, 2019, through June 9, 2019, as National Fishing and Boating Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of the week of June 1, 2019, through June 9, 2019, as National Fishing and Boating Week.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR174 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 04/30/2019 S2523)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback