US SR174 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 04/30/2019 S2523)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of June 1, 2019, through June 9, 2019, as "National Fishing and Boating Week". This resolution (1) designates the week of June 1-June 9, 2019, as National Fishing and Boating Week; and (2) recognizes that the recreational boating community and the boating industry should be commended for their numerous contributions to the economy, the well-being of citizens, and responsible environmental stewardship of water resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of June 1, 2019, through June 9, 2019, as "National Fishing and Boating Week".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 04/30/2019 S2523)
2019-06-05SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3267-3268)
2019-04-30SenateReferred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HR175 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback