US HR1406 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of all Department of the Interior documents, maps, records, communications, and other information dating from July 1, 2009, and later referring or relating to a specified document concerning the potential designation of national monuments under the Antiquities Act, including such document, all attachments, and all iterations of that document, and related similar documents.
Title
Directing the Secretary of the Interior to transmit to the House of Representatives certain information relating to the potential designation of National Monuments.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Elton Gallegly [R-CA] |
Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Denny Rehberg [R-MT] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 205. | |
2010-06-23 | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-510. | |
2010-06-16 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2010-06-16 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1238 (Related) 2010-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR1254 (Related) 2010-05-11 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
HR1254 (Related) 2010-05-11 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials