US HR1254 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of all Department of the Interior documents, maps, records, communications, and other information dating from July 1, 2009, and later referring or relating to the potential designation of national monuments, the Secretary's Treasured Landscape Initiative, and high priority land-rationalization efforts, as specified.
Title
Directing the Secretary of the Interior to transmit to the House of Representatives certain information relating to the Secretary's Treasured Landscape Initiative, potential designation of National Monuments, and High Priority Land-Rationalization Efforts.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Denny Rehberg [R-MT] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 195. | |
2010-05-11 | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-480. | |
2010-05-05 | Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote. | |
2010-05-05 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1238 (Related) 2010-04-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HR1406 (Related) 2010-06-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
HR1406 (Related) 2010-06-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials