US HR1283 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of June 6, 2024, as National Naloxone Awareness Day.
Title
Supporting the designation of June 6, 2024, as National Naloxone Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Brittany Pettersen [D-CO] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR250 (Related) 2023-06-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2076; text: CR S2075)
HR476 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR726 (Related) 2024-06-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4002; text: CR S3993-3994)
HR476 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR726 (Related) 2024-06-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4002; text: CR S3993-3994)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/1283/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres1283/BILLS-118hres1283ih.pdf |