US HR1278 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Safe Digging Month. Encourages homeowners and excavators to call 811 before conducting any digging or excavation activities.
Title
In support and recognition of National Safe Digging Month, April, 2010.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-05 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3171) | |
2010-05-05 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1278. | |
2010-05-05 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3171-3172) | |
2010-05-05 | Ms. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 191. | |
2010-05-04 | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-473, Part I. | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. | |
2010-04-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-04-29 | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged. | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SR472 (Related) 2010-03-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2167-2168; text as passed Senate: CR S2168; text of measure as introduced: CR S2164)
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Commemorative events and holidays
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency communications systems
Pipelines
Public utilities and utility rates
Water use and supply