US HR1270 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of Mathematics Awareness Month. Encourages colleges, universities, and other organizations to hold events to honor Mathematics Awareness Month. Supports increased public awareness and appreciation for the importance of mathematics at all levels of the educational system in the United States.
Title
Expressing support for Mathematics Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness. | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-04-22 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 2 (Roll no. 220). (text: CR 4/21/2010 H2762) | |
2010-04-22 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2817-2818) | |
2010-04-21 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-04-21 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1270. | |
2010-04-21 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2762-2763) | |
2010-04-21 | Mr. Sablan moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1263 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.