US HR1114 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the week of October 7, 2018, through October 13, 2018, as "Latex Allergy Awareness Week". Expresses support for the designation of Latex Allergy Awareness Week.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of October 7, 2018, through October 13, 2018, as "Latex Allergy Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR542 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/1114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres1114/BILLS-115hres1114ih.pdf |