US HR1061 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the concurrence by the House in the Senate amendment to H.R. 4366, with an amendment.
Title
Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2024 Compact of Free Association Amendments Act of 2024 Department of Housing and Urban Development Appropriations Act, 2024 Department of the Interior, Environment, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2024 Energy and Water Development and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2024 Agriculture, Rural Development, Food and Drug Administration, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree RC# 64 (Y: 339 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 339 - 85 (Roll no. 64). |
2024-03-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-03-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-03-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1061. |
2024-03-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-03-06 | House | Ms. Granger moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HJR96 (Related) 2023-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HB4368 (Related) 2023-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4820 (Related) 2023-11-07 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 4820 would be postponed.
HB7091 (Related) 2024-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SJR48 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1994 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2127 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 110.
SB2131 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 111.
SB2437 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
SB2605 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
HB1571 (Related) 2023-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SB792 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3605 (Related) 2024-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S150)
HB7545 (Related) 2024-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB1453 (Related) 2023-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3736 (Related) 2023-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4821 (Related) 2023-11-07 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
HB5893 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 869 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5893 and H.R. 5961. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5893, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5961 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
HB7040 (Related) 2024-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2321 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 132.
SB2443 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 145.
SB3136 (Related) 2023-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3244 (Related) 2023-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HJR96 (Related) 2023-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
HB4368 (Related) 2023-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4820 (Related) 2023-11-07 - POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced further proceedings on H.R. 4820 would be postponed.
HB7091 (Related) 2024-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SJR48 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1994 (Related) 2023-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2127 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 110.
SB2131 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 111.
SB2437 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
SB2605 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
HB1571 (Related) 2023-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SB792 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3605 (Related) 2024-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S150)
HB7545 (Related) 2024-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB1453 (Related) 2023-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3736 (Related) 2023-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4821 (Related) 2023-11-07 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
HB5893 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 869 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5893 and H.R. 5961. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5893, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5961 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit.
HB7040 (Related) 2024-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2321 (Related) 2023-07-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 132.
SB2443 (Related) 2023-07-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 145.
SB3136 (Related) 2023-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3244 (Related) 2023-11-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.