US SB792 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Act of 1996 to provide certain Federal public benefits to citizens of the Federated States of Micronesia, the Republic of the Marshall Islands, and the Republic of Palau who are lawfully residing in the United States if they are otherwise qualified, consistent with section 141 of the Compacts of Free Association.
Title
Compact Impact Fairness Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1571 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
HJR96 (Related) 2023-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
SJR48 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HR1061 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR96 (Related) 2023-11-08 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
SJR48 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HR1061 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/792/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s792/BILLS-118s792is.pdf |