US SB3136 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to extend the requirement for State Medicaid plans to provide coverage for medication-assisted treatment.
Title
Extending Access to Addiction Treatment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4531 (Related) 2023-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HR1061 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4366 (Related) 2024-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 118-42.
HR1061 (Related) 2024-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3136/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3136/BILLS-118s3136is.pdf |