US HR1030 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for National Public Health week, recognizes the efforts of public health professionals in preventing infectious and other diseases and injuries, and encourages strengthening the public health system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR279 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR300 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5274; text: CR S5258)
SR662 (Same As) 2020-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549)
SR300 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5274; text: CR S5258)
SR662 (Same As) 2020-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549)
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority health
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1030/BILLS-116hres1030ih.pdf |