US HR279 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for National Public Health week, recognizes the efforts of public health professionals, and encourages strengthening the public health system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR300 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5274; text: CR S5258)
HR1030 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR662 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549)
HR1030 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR662 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/279/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres279/BILLS-116hres279ih.pdf |