US SR662 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for National Public Health week, recognizes the efforts of public health professionals in preventing infectious and other diseases and injuries, and encourages strengthening the public health system.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-28 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4549-4550; text: CR S4548-4549) |
Same As/Similar To
HR279 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1030 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR300 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5274; text: CR S5258)
HR1030 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR300 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5274; text: CR S5258)
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority health
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/662/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres662/BILLS-116sres662ats.pdf |