US HJR99 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-31 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232, Pursuant to Sec. 1002 of Public Law 113-46.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-31 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232, Pursuant to Sec. 1002 of Public Law 113-46.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves of the President's exercise of authority to suspend the debt limit.
Title
Relating to the disapproval of the President's exercise of authority to suspend the debt limit, as submitted under section 1002(b) of the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2014 on October 17, 2013.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Roll Calls
2013-10-30 - House - On Passage (Y: 222 N: 191 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232, Pursuant to Sec. 1002 of Public Law 113-46. |
2013-10-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-10-30 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 191, 2 Present (Roll no. 570). (text: CR 10/29/2013 H6872) |
2013-10-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6928) |
2013-10-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J.Res. 99, the Chair put the question on passage of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Levin demanded the yeas and nays the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage of the joint resolution until a time to be announced. |
2013-10-29 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6876) |
2013-10-29 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to H.Res. 391 and section 1002(e)(2)(c) of the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2014, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 99. |
2013-10-29 | House | Considered under the provisions of H.Res. 391 and section 1002(e) of the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2014. (consideration: CR H6872-6876) |
2013-10-29 | House | On motion to consider Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H6872) |
2013-10-29 | House | Pursuant to H. Res. 931 and section 1002(e) of the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2014, Mr. Young (IN) moved that the House consider H.J.Res. 99. (consideration: H6872) |
2013-10-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR26 (Same As) 2013-10-29 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 220.
HR391 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR391 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Presidents and presidential powers
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Presidents and presidential powers