US SJR26 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-29 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 220.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-29 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 220.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves of the President's exercise of authority to suspend the debt limit.
Title
A joint resolution relating to the disapproval of the President's exercise of authority to suspend the debt limit, as submitted under section 1002(b) of the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2014 on October 17, 2013.
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
Roll Calls
2013-10-29 - Senate - On the Motion to Proceed S.J.Res. 26 (Y: 45 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-29 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 220. |
2013-10-29 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7585-7595, S7595) |
2013-10-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223 pursuant to Sec. 1002 of Public Law 113-46. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7580) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR99 (Same As) 2013-10-31 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232, Pursuant to Sec. 1002 of Public Law 113-46.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Presidents and presidential powers
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Presidents and presidential powers