US HJR98 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 69-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to "Standard for Determining Joint Employer Status".
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to "Standard for Determining Joint Employer Status".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - On the Joint Resolution H.J.Res. 98 RC# 122 (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - On Passage RC# 10 (Y: 206 N: 177 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - On Passage RC# 10 (Y: 206 N: 177 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 122. (text: CR S2695) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-01-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-12 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 177 (Roll no. 10). (text: CR H113) |
2024-01-12 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 206 - 177 (Roll no. 10). |
2024-01-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H124-125) |
2024-01-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-01-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 98, the Chair put the question on passage of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-01-12 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-01-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 98. |
2024-01-12 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 788, H.J. Res. 98 and S.J. Res. 38. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 788 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 98 and S.J. Res. 38 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate on each joint resolution. Also, the resolution provides for a motion to recommit on H.R. 788 and H.J. Res. 98. A motion to commit on S.J. Res. 38. |
2024-01-12 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 947. (consideration: CR H112-124) |
2024-01-12 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 947. |
2024-01-09 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 947 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 788, H.J. Res. 98 and S.J. Res. 38. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 788 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 98 and S.J. Res. 38 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate on each joint resolution. Also, the resolution provides for a motion to recommit on H.R. 788 and H.J. Res. 98. A motion to commit on S.J. Res. 38. |
2024-01-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 277. |
2024-01-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 118-338. |
2023-12-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 20. |
2023-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2023-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR49 (Same As) 2023-11-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR947 (Related) 2024-01-11 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 211 - 202, 1 Present (Roll no. 5). (text: 01/10/2024 CR H25)
HR947 (Related) 2024-01-11 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 211 - 202, 1 Present (Roll no. 5). (text: 01/10/2024 CR H25)