US HB959 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medgar Evers House Study Act (Sec. 3) Directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the home of the late civil rights activist Medgar Evers, which is located at 2332 Margaret Walker Alexander Drive in Jackson, Mississippi. Requires Interior to: (1) evaluate the national significance of the site; (2) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the site as a unit of the National Park System (NPS); (3) determine the effect of the site's designation on existing commercial and recreational uses, and the effect on state and local governments to manage those activities; and (4) identify any authorities, including condemnation, that will compel or permit the Department of the Interior to influence or participate in local land use decisions (such as zoning) or place restrictions on nonfederal land if the site is designated as an NPS unit.
Title
Medgar Evers House Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-335. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2015-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5994) |
2015-09-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 959. |
2015-09-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5994-5995) |
2015-09-16 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190. |
2015-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-251. |
2015-07-09 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-07-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-07-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2177 (Related) 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 597.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB3068 (Related) 2016-06-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
SB3054 (Related) 2016-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB3068 (Related) 2016-06-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
SB3054 (Related) 2016-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Mississippi
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Mississippi
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations