US HB9087 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To restart onshore and offshore oil and gas leasing, streamline permitting for energy infrastructure, ensure transparency in energy development on Federal lands, and for other purposes.
Title
TAP American Energy Act Transparency And Production of American Energy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2022-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2022-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2022-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2100 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB6927 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB7293 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7298 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7304 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7306 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9004 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9006 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB9012 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9024 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB9025 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1012 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB9193 (Related) 2022-10-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB6927 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB7293 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7298 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7304 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB7306 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9004 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9006 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB9012 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB9024 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB9025 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1012 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB9193 (Related) 2022-10-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/9087/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr9087/BILLS-117hr9087ih.pdf |