US HB8860 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Attorney General to include certain additional information in the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System, and for other purposes.
Title
TRACE Act Tracking and Reporting Absent Community-Members Everywhere Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-10-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2022-09-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-09-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8860/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8860/BILLS-117hr8860ih.pdf |