US HB8838 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect health care providers and people seeking reproductive health care services, and for other purposes.
Title
SHIELD Act Safeguard Healthcare Industry Employees from Litigation and Distress Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2022-09-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8105-8106) |
2022-09-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-09-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7869) |
2022-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8838/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8838/BILLS-117hr8838ih.pdf |