US HB8503 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide States with support to establish integrated care programs for individuals who are dually eligible for Medicare and Medicaid, and for other purposes.
Title
DUALS Act of 2024 Delivering Unified Access to Lifesaving Services Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3950 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1703 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3549 (Related) 2023-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1703 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3549 (Related) 2023-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/8503/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr8503/BILLS-118hr8503ih.pdf |