US HB8297 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 183-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the interference, under color of State law, with the provision of interstate abortion services, and for other purposes.
Title
Ensuring Women’s Right to Reproductive Freedom Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-15 - House - On passage (Y: 223 N: 205 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-07-15 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-07-15 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 219 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 205 (Roll no. 362). (text: CR H6647) |
2022-07-15 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 219 (Roll no. 361). |
2022-07-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6661-6663) |
2022-07-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8297, the Chair put the question on the Johnson(LA) motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Johnson (LA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-07-15 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-07-15 | House | Mr. Johnson (LA) moved to recommit to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H6659-6660) |
2022-07-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8297. |
2022-07-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7900, S. 3373, H.R. 8296, H.R. 8297 and H.R. 6538 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-07-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1224. (consideration: CR H6647-6660) |
2022-07-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1224 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7900, S. 3373, H.R. 8296, H.R. 8297 and H.R. 6538 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1224 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.