US HR1224 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 7900) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2023 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (S. 3373) to improve the Iraq and Afghanistan Service Grant and the Children of Fallen Heroes Grant; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 8296) to protect a person’s ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider’s ability to provide abortion services; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 8297) to prohibit the interference, under color of State law, with the provision of interstate abortion services, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6538) to create an Active Shooter Alert Communications Network, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 7900) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2023 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (S. 3373) to improve the Iraq and Afghanistan Service Grant and the Children of Fallen Heroes Grant; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 8296) to protect a person’s ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider’s ability to provide abortion services; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 8297) to prohibit the interference, under color of State law, with the provision of interstate abortion services, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 6538) to create an Active Shooter Alert Communications Network, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-13 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 218 N: 208 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-07-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 217 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-07-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 217 N: 204 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-13 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 204 (Roll no. 304). (text: CR H5983) |
2022-07-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5992-5993) |
2022-07-13 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 8, Rule XX, further proceedings on H. Res. 1224 were postponed. |
2022-07-13 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 218 - 208 (Roll no. 303). (consideration: CR H5990-5991) |
2022-07-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1224. |
2022-07-13 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5983-5991) |
2022-07-13 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7900, S. 3373, H.R. 8296, H.R. 8297 and H.R. 6538 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-07-13 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 86. |
2022-07-13 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-405, by Mr. Morelle. |
2022-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6538 (Related) 2022-07-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7900 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6063-6466)
HB8296 (Related) 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
HR1224 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8297 (Related) 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
SB3373 (Related) 2022-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-168.
HB7900 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6063-6466)
HB8296 (Related) 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
HR1224 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8297 (Related) 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
SB3373 (Related) 2022-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-168.