US HB8296 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To protect a person’s ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider’s ability to provide abortion services.
Title
Women’s Health Protection Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-15 - House - On passage (Y: 219 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-15 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-07-15 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 210 (Roll no. 360). (text: CR H6631-6634) |
2022-07-15 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 218 (Roll no. 359). |
2022-07-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6660-6661) |
2022-07-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 8296, the Chair put the question on the Fischbach motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Fischbach demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-07-15 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2022-07-15 | House | Mrs. Fischbach moved to recommit to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H6646-6647) |
2022-07-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 8296. |
2022-07-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7900, S. 3373, H.R. 8296, H.R. 8297 and H.R. 6538 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-07-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1224. (consideration: CR H6631-6647) |
2022-07-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1224 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 7900, S. 3373, H.R. 8296, H.R. 8297 and H.R. 6538 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3755 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 48. Record Vote Number: 65. (CR S826)
SB1975 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4132 (Related) 2022-05-11 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 51. Record Vote Number: 170. (CR S2439)
HR1224 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1975 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4132 (Related) 2022-05-11 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 51. Record Vote Number: 170. (CR S2439)
HR1224 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.