US HB8183 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot grant program to improve recycling accessibility, and for other purposes.
Title
Recycling Infrastructure and Accessibility Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3742 (Same As) 2022-08-02 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-136.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8183/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8183/BILLS-117hr8183ih.pdf |