US SB3742 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-02 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-136.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-02 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-136.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a pilot grant program to improve recycling accessibility, and for other purposes.
Title
Recycling Infrastructure and Accessibility Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-02 | Senate | By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-136. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-07-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-07-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3755-3756; text: CR S3755-3756) |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 357. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8183 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.