US HB8163 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to trauma care.
Title
Improving Trauma Systems and Emergency Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to section 10 of H. Res. 1396, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1638, as amended; H.R. 3304, as amended; H.R. 4081, as amended; H.R. 4821, as amended; H.R. 6889, as amended; H.R. 6967, as amended; H.R. 8163, as amended; H.R. 8510, as amended; H.R. 8681, as amended; H.R. 8875, as amended; H.R. 8956; S. 1198; and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 5641. (text: CR H8150-8151) |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1396, proceedings on H.R. 8163 are considered vacated. |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8163. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8150-8152) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-514. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 55 - 1. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2022-09-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3566 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S497-498)
SB3799 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
HR1396 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3799 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
HR1396 (Related) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.