US SB3799 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prepare for, and respond to, existing viruses, emerging new threats, and pandemics.
Title
PREVENT Pandemics Act Prepare for and Respond to Existing Viruses, Emerging New Threats, and Pandemics Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5442 (Related) 2021-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5478 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6305 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6980 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3394 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3449 (Related) 2022-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3496 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3566 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S497-498)
SB3569 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S525)
HB5626 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6363 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3395 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3476 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3477 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3479 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3493 (Related) 2022-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S191-192)
SB3506 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3534 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3588 (Related) 2022-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3800 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3814 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7152 (Related) 2022-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3913 (Related) 2022-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1775-1776)
SB3834 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7669 (Related) 2022-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB8151 (Related) 2022-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB8163 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8481 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5478 (Related) 2021-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6305 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6980 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3394 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3449 (Related) 2022-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3496 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3566 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S497-498)
SB3569 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S525)
HB5626 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6363 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3395 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3476 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3477 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3479 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3493 (Related) 2022-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S191-192)
SB3506 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3534 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3588 (Related) 2022-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3800 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3814 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7152 (Related) 2022-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB3913 (Related) 2022-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1775-1776)
SB3834 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7669 (Related) 2022-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB8151 (Related) 2022-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB8163 (Related) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8481 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3799/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3799/BILLS-117s3799is.pdf |