US SB3566 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S497-498)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S497-498)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to trauma care.
Title
Improving Trauma Systems and Emergency Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S497-498) |
Same As/Similar To
SB3799 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
HB8163 (Same As) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8163 (Same As) 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3566/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3566/BILLS-117s3566is.pdf |