US HB8083 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit Federal funding for National Public Radio, and for other purposes.
Title
Defund NPR Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Richard McCormick [R-GA] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2024-04-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-04-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1632 (Related) 2023-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB8286 (Related) 2024-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB8286 (Related) 2024-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/8083/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr8083/BILLS-118hr8083ih.pdf |