US HB7278 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 161-3)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JUSTICE Act Just and Unifying Solutions To Invigorate Communities Everywhere Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUSTICE Act Just and Unifying Solutions To Invigorate Communities Everywhere Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. George Holding [R-NC]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]
Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA]
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]
Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-18HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-18HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-06-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB35 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate.
HB1574 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1636 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB3536 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB488 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB855 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2163 (Related) 2020-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-156. (TXT | PDF)
SB2434 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3985 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 126) entered in Senate.
SB4064 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7907 (Related) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8088 (Related) 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback