US HB8088 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands activities to reduce the use of excessive force by law enforcement officers, including by providing funding for grants to expand the use of body-worn cameras and to develop training programs.
Title
To provide funding to law enforcement agencies, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4267-4268) |
2020-08-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
SB4064 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
SB4064 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Photography and imaging
State and local government operations
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Photography and imaging
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8088/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8088/BILLS-116hr8088ih.pdf |