US SB2163 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-156. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Became Public Law No: 116-156. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys within the U.S. Commission on Civil Rights Office of the Staff Director to conduct a systematic study of the conditions affecting Black men and boys.
Title
Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] |
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 368 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 61) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-156. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 368 - 1 (Roll no. 167). (text: CR H3873) |
2020-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2163. |
2020-07-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3873-3878) |
2020-07-27 | House | Mrs. McBath moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-06-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S3281-3282) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | S.Amdt.1809 Amendment SA 1809 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | S.Amdt.1809 Amendment SA 1809 proposed by Senator Hawley for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S3281; text: CR S3281) To require an equal number of Republicans and Democrats to serve on the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3281-3282) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1636 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Child health
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commission on Civil Rights
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Higher education
Minority health
Poverty and welfare assistance
Racial and ethnic relations
Violent crime
Child health
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commission on Civil Rights
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Higher education
Minority health
Poverty and welfare assistance
Racial and ethnic relations
Violent crime