US HB7219 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 687.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure that Federal agencies rely on the best reasonably available scientific, technical, demographic, economic, and statistical information and evidence to develop, issue or inform the public of the nature and bases of Federal agency rules and guidance, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information Quality Assurance Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 177 (Y: 377 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 687.
2024-12-09SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-284.
2024-09-18SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2024-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2024-05-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-05-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 4 (Roll no. 177). (text: CR H2842-2843)
2024-05-06HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2858-2859)
2024-05-06HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2024-05-06HouseConsidered as unfinished business.
2024-05-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7219.
2024-05-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2842-2844)
2024-05-06HouseMr. LaTurner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-04-29HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 394.
2024-04-29HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2024-04-29HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Accountability. H. Rept. 118-475, Part I.
2024-02-06HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 0.
2024-02-06HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2024-02-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback