US HB7189 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 118-107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize a national congenital heart disease research, surveillance, and awareness program, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congenital Heart Futures Reauthorization Act of 2024

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-21HouseBecame Public Law No: 118-107.
2024-11-21HouseSigned by President.
2024-11-15HousePresented to President.
2024-09-26SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2024-09-25SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6466)
2024-09-24SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2024-09-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-09-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5588-5589)
2024-09-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7189.
2024-09-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5588-5589)
2024-09-23HouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-05-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 429.
2024-05-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-517.
2024-03-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.
2024-03-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-03-12HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 0.
2024-03-12HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-02-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2024-02-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2024-02-01HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback