US HB7084 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require, for purposes of ensuring cybersecurity, the inclusion in any premarket submission for a cyber device of information to demonstrate a reasonable assurance of safety and effectiveness throughout the lifecycle of the cyber device, and for other purposes.
Title
PATCH Act of 2022 Protecting and Transforming Cyber Health Care Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3983 (Related) 2022-03-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7667 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate.
HB7667 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7084/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7084/BILLS-117hr7084ih.pdf |