US HB668 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 to eliminate automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress.
Title
To eliminate automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB342 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5946 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5946 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/668/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr668/BILLS-115hr668ih.pdf |