US HB342 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Raise for Congress Act This bill amends the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 to eliminate automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress.
Title
No Raise for Congress Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB668 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5946 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5946 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/342/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr342/BILLS-115hr342ih.pdf |