US HB5946 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FAITH in Congress Act Foster Accountability, Integrity, Trust, and Honor in Congress Act
Title
FAITH in Congress Act Foster Accountability, Integrity, Trust, and Honor in Congress Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4697-4698) |
2018-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB668 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4187 (Related) 2017-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5232 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4509 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB342 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB4187 (Related) 2017-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5232 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4509 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB342 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Budget process
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
House of Representatives
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Aviation and airports
Budget process
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
House of Representatives
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5946/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5946/BILLS-115hr5946ih.pdf |