US HB1951 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NOPE Act No Ongoing Perks Enrichment Act This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a house of Congress that has not agreed to a budget resolution for FY2018 by April 15, 2017, as required by the Congressional Budget Act of 1974. Salaries are withheld from April 16, 2017, until the house of Congress agrees to a budget resolution or the last day of the 115th Congress, whichever is earlier. The bill amends the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 to eliminate automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress. The bill prohibits use of funds appropriated or otherwise made available for the official travel of a Member of Congress or other officer or employee of the legislative branch for airline accommodations that are not coach-class accommodations. This prohibition shall not apply to an individual if the use would be permitted for an employee of an agency subject to specified federal regulations for temporary duty travel allowances. The bill amends the federal criminal code to increase to five years the post-employment lobbying ban on a former member of the U.S. Senate (currently, two years) or a former member of the U.S. House of Representatives (currently, one year).
Title
NOPE Act No Ongoing Perks Enrichment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D-NV] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB342 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB429 (Related) 2017-01-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB668 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4509 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5946 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB429 (Related) 2017-01-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB668 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4509 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5946 (Related) 2018-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
House of Representatives
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
Transportation costs
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Congress
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
House of Representatives
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1951/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1951/BILLS-115hr1951ih.pdf |