US HB6578 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a student loan repayment program for public health professionals. As a condition of participation, recipients must agree to complete a period of full-time employment with a state, tribal, or local public health agency.
Title
Public Health Workforce Loan Repayment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Contracts and agency
Education programs funding
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Medical education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Education programs funding
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Medical education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6578/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6578/BILLS-116hr6578ih.pdf |