US HB6454 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the primary functions and duties of the Office of Advocacy of the Small Business Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
Small Business Advocacy Improvements Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4474-4475) |
2022-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6454. |
2022-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4474-4475) |
2022-04-26 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 186. |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 117-256. |
2022-02-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7628 (Related) 2022-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.