US HB6450 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act to reauthorize the SCORE program, and for other purposes.
Title
SCORE for Small Business Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4470-4472) |
2022-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6450. |
2022-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4470-4473) |
2022-04-26 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 187. |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 117-257. |
2022-02-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB5191 (Related) 2022-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.