US HB6398 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the rates of pay under the statutory pay systems and for prevailing rate employees by 5.1 percent, and for other purposes.
Title
FAIR Act Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB392 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB561 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3518 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB561 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3518 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6398/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6398/BILLS-117hr6398ih.pdf |