US SB561 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to increase the rates of pay under the statutory pay systems and for prevailing rate employees by 3.2 percent, and for other purposes.
Title
FAIR Act Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB392 (Same As) 2021-01-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB6398 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB3518 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6398 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB3518 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/561/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s561/BILLS-117s561is.pdf |